Accounts and annual returns OUSEBURN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 512540
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 April 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 April 2021 61 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 June 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 June 2020 131 days late