Plymouth City Brass

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Plymouth City Brass, based in Plymouth, Devon provide members with the opportunity to receive education and training at the members desired level through the regular rehearsals, concerts and competitions they participate in, this also aids the promotion of the musical art of brass band music within the general public. Membership of the bands is open to any member of the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 13 July 2018: CIO registration
- SOUNDHOUSE BRASS PLYMOUTH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Pumford | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Rowland | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Craze | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JEFFERY | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH AYRE | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GEARS | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.96k | £12.43k | £29.54k | £10.10k | £20.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.31k | £6.09k | £15.42k | £20.34k | £15.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 04 JUN 2020 as amended on 08 Mar 2022 as amended on 27 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE MUSICAL ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ART, THROUGH PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, CONCERTS AND COMPETITIONS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, WITHIN THE PLYMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE MUSICAL ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING, BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, WITHIN THE PLYMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Oak Tree Park
PLYMOUTH
PL6 7JZ
- Phone:
- 01752783788
- Email:
- Soundhousebrass4@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window