AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides medicine and advocacy to over 1,000,000 people in 45 countries suffering with Aids/HIV. The worldwide charity is the largest provider of HIV/AIDS medical care in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 January 2019: Standard registration
- AHF UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL WEINSTEIN | Chair | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERESA MARIE FORD | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £138.26k | £212.91k | £214.18k | £314.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £140.17k | £216.25k | £220.60k | £311.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 December 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROMOTION OF BETTER HIV, SEXUAL AND GENERAL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE PROVISION OF (A) HIV AND SEXUAL HEALTH PROGRAMMES AND MATERIAL, CARE AND SUPPORT SERVICES; (B) CLINICAL SERVICES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HOSPICE AND HEATH CARE SERVICES TO HIV/AIDS AND OTHER PATIENTS, AND ENGAGING IN RELATED EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; (C) ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ADVOCACY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION (AHF) UK
24 George Street
CROYDON
LONDON
UK
CR0 1PB
- Phone:
- +13238695200
- Email:
- info@aidshealth.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window