ROTHERHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of local news on audio cassette, memory stick or CD for blind or visually impaired people in the local area. Also provision of weekly and monthly audio magazines
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 15 April 1982: Standard registration
- ROTHERHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROTHERHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA JANE ASTLE | Chair | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Rhodes | Trustee | 13 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Susan Birch | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Denise Lilleker | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BINSTEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY BELINDA WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.06k | £36.35k | £18.17k | £20.99k | £21.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.00k | £29.77k | £27.69k | £23.09k | £28.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/01/1982 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/1982 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY, WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rotherham Talking Newspapers
Rosehill VICTORIA PARK
Rawmarsh
ROTHERHAM
S62 7HJ
- Phone:
- 01709 522429
- Email:
- rothnewstalk@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window