THE SHREWSBURY FURNITURE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity collects donated household goods from the local area (around Shrewsbury), refurbishes & stores them as necessary before selling them on at extremely low prices to those in need within the same local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 25 July 2018: CIO registration
- 12 January 2020: Funds received from 1047760 THE SHREWSBURY FURNITURE SCHEME
- HOME ESSENTIALS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Barr Strachan | Chair | 25 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Pearson | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Bryant | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hall | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BAKER | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.14k | £175.44k | £132.55k | £148.91k | £183.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.58k | £121.11k | £133.40k | £161.43k | £201.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £78.29k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT, BY: A) PROVIDING RELIEF FOR NEEDY OR DISTRESSED PERSONS RESIDENT IN SHREWSBURY, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY THE PROVISION TO THEM OF ESSENTIAL FURNITURE, AND HOUSEHOLD AND ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT B) COLLECTING SUCH DONATED FURNITURE AND EQUIPMENT FOR CHECKING, REPAIRING, REFURBISHING, STORING AND SUBSEQUENT SUPPLY RECYCLING, RE-USING, RENOVATING AND REPAIRING FURNITURE, HOUSEHOLD AND ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE DISPOSED OF AS LANDFILL C) EMPOWERING THE UNEMPLOYED AND OTHERS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, PROVIDING THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO ACQUIRE AND PRACTISE SKILLS BOTH D) TO GAIN CONFIDENCE AND CONTRIBUTE TO THE COMMUNITY BY ESTABLISHING VOLUNTEER TRAINING SCHEMES TO UNDERTAKE REPAIR AND REFURBISHMENT FOR RE-CYCLING E) EDUCATING AND INFORMING THE PUBLIC ABOUT SUSTAINABLE LIFESTYLES AND THE BENEFITS TO THE COMMUNITY OF RECYCLING, RE-USE AND ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY WASTE MANAGEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 9b Hartley Business Centre
272-284 Monkmoor Road
Shrewsbury
Shropshire
SY2 5ST
- Phone:
- 01743246668
- Email:
- furniturescheme@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window