CITY OF LICHFIELD TOWNSWOMENS GUILD

Charity number: 1180496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

we are a women's group that meet once a month and arrange various charitable events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £4,282
Total expenditure: £3,672

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LESLEY DOWNIE Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
VALERIE MADDOCKS Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
JUDE MOTTRAM Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
MAUREEN HANSON Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Helen Carr Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
KAY BYWATER Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE DAVIES Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
MARGARET ROBERTS Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Jane Dayus-Hinch Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £5.96k £3.36k £2.36k £3.99k £4.28k
Total expenditure £2.39k £2.71k £2.51k £2.64k £3.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 04 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Willows
Alrewas Road
Kings Bromley
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE13 7HP
Phone:
07718523561
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available