BLANK CANVAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running needs-based projects to allow young people to create new stories of hope.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 500 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Tate | Chair | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristian Shephard | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Theobalds | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bridget Ann Wodall | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Reiter | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £12.37k | £20.46k | £20.14k | £70.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.49k | £12.30k | £13.50k | £18.52k | £34.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £765 | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2019 as amended on 27 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF BLANK CANVAS ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Palace Hub
28-29 Esplanade
REDCAR
Cleveland
TS10 3AE
- Phone:
- 07355 674194
- Email:
- info@blankcanvasyouth.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window