Financial history THE THINBLUELINEUK

Charity number: 1184042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £19.66k £12.67k £28.88k £17.78k £61.90k
Total expenditure £30.17k £8.09k £17.11k £19.56k £30.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A