FREE MOVEMENT SKATEBOARDING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free Movement Skateboarding are a registered charity based in Athens (Greece) who provide skateboarding workshops and an educational program which work to empower underprivileged youth and bring communities together. Their programs focus on improving the physical and mental wellbeing of the young people they work with, whilst promoting gender parity and aiding social cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greece
Governance
- 29 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Paul Ascott | Chair | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Keshini Mauree | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.98k | £74.10k | £74.40k | £45.72k | £52.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.30k | £56.32k | £59.25k | £64.15k | £72.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SKATEBOARDING. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Marshals Drive
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 4RD
- Phone:
- 07598352774
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window