BIRMINGHAM YOUNG VOLUNTEERS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY SERVICE THAT FULFILS NEEDS OF THE LOCAL DEPRIVED CHILDREN AND FAMILIES TO FOCUS ON ERADICATING POVERTY, DISADVANTAGE AND PROVIDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN A SAFE PLACE TO LEARN, PLAY AND DEVELOP LIFE-LONG SKILLS PROVISION OF A VARIETY OF EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL SERVICES TO CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, ADULTS AND OAPS AT OUR COMMUNITY CENTRE IN BIRMINGHAM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 22 April 1982: Standard registration
- 21 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 16 March 2018: Re-registered
- ADVENTURE CAMPS (Working name)
- BYV (Working name)
- BYV ADVENTURE CAMPS WALLACE LAWLER CENTRE (Working name)
- WALLACE LAWLER CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Augustus Ambrose | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Uroy Kelly | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lauretta Riley | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.84k | £12.90k | £19.14k | £14.00k | £21.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.44k | £15.02k | £19.09k | £13.40k | £22.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 April 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 1982.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS BY ENCOURAGING YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN VOLUNTARY SERVICE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE YOUNG PERSONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
199 Wheeler Street
BIRMINGHAM
B19 2EL
- Phone:
- 01213844380
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window