STRENGTHENING COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in African with a focus on three main objectives. Providing education for female children from 0 to 18 years. We also provide training in culinary, sewing, etc skills for young girls who would rather explore a none academic route of learning. Lastly, we provide solar-powered boreholes in communities in need of clean safe water.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nigeria
Governance
- 03 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EKEOMA NWAJIUBA | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
NNABUGO NWAJIUBA | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHINENYE ADAKU OKOLIE | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 September 2024 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2025 | 343 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN NIGERIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: PROVIDING SUSTAINABLE WATER SUPPLY IN COMMUNITIES WITH LIMITED OPTIONS TO SAFE, CLEAN WATER; DELIVERING TRAINING IN COMMUNITIES AND TO LOCAL HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS AND PROVIDING ADDITIONAL RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT WITH THE AIM OF REDUCING THE RATE OF MATERNAL/INFANT MORTALITY; PROVIDING SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE GIRLS UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS TO CONTINUE WITH EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Avoncroft Road
Stoke Heath
BROMSGROVE
B60 4NG
- Phone:
- 07773021757
- Email:
- contact@strengthening.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window