THE HALE BARNS ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hale Barns Arts Trust is established for the encouragement of the Arts within Hale Barns and its neighbourhood. The trustees will consider grant proposals for any artistic exhibition or event for the benefit of the public in that neighbourhood. The trustees would also be pleased to hear from any potential donors who would like to support the objectives of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Trafford
Governance
- 21 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nattrass | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOYCE MARY FULLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £1 | £0 | £3 | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION APPROVED 8TH FEBRUARY 1982
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN HALE BARNS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD, PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, PAINTING SCULPTURE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE ONLY. B. FOR SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND PURPOSES AND OBJECTS EJUSDEM GENENS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HALE BARNS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 OLLERBARROW ROAD
HALE
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 9PP
- Phone:
- 01619282679
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window