SOMETHING TO AIM FOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health or saving of lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,023 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 February 2019: CIO registration
- THE SICK OF THE FRINGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harpreet Kaur | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Callum Shallcross | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Simpson | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Gerard Hanlon | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Head | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matt Burman | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Brian Lobel | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Kirsty Fairclough | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD FRANCIS BERG | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.51k | £435.98k | £241.69k | £38.65k | £190.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.63k | £391.75k | £314.31k | £185.28k | £159.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.80k | N/A | N/A | £21.02k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £162.39k | £14.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING GREATER PARTICIPATION BY GROUPS WHO ARE UNDER-REPRESENTED IN THE ARTS FIELD, PARTICULARLY BY REASON OF DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPACES
PETER HOUSE
OXFORD STREET
MANCHESTER
M1 5AN
- Phone:
- 07594013301
- Email:
- janet@somethingtoaimfor.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window