Financial history PROJECT INDI

Charity number: 1183838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/06/2020 11/06/2021 11/06/2022 11/06/2023 11/06/2024
Total gross income £80.29k £125.95k £282.21k £340.25k £308.85k
Total expenditure £33.66k £99.05k £173.72k £285.36k £281.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.50k £6.67k £58.58k N/A