MUHYIDDIN IBN ARABI SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make the work of Muhyiddin Ibn Arabi widely available. Present educational events, symposia, public lectures and seminars. Publish a Journal . Maintain & update a library. Collect, preserve and make available a manuscript archive. Facilitate the scholarly study and translations of these works. Give grants to facilitate these activities. Run & subsidise educational courses for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 July 2018: CIO registration
- IBN ARABI SOCIETY (Working name)
- IBN ARABI SOCIETY, OXFORD (Working name)
- MIAS UK (Working name)
- MUHYIDDIN IBN 'ARABI SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aishah Safdar | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Omar Zein | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne-Marie Morrissey | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Julian Hornsby | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yafiah Katherine Randall | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Youakim | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAM TWINCH MA CANTAB | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martha Elizabeth Cass | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|||||
LUCY DIANA BARRATT MA | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.01k | £42.90k | £45.77k | £133.12k | £22.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.86k | £26.33k | £22.97k | £24.98k | £33.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE OF THE WORKS AND IDEALS OF MUHYIDDIN IBN ARABI (1165-1240 CE) AND THOSE PEOPLE WHO HAVE PERPETUATED THEM BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT BUT INCLUDING STUDY, RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, PUBLICATION, TRANSLATION, AND COMMUNICATION OF HIS WRITTEN WORKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MHA
4 Foundation Park
Roxborough Way
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 3UD
- Phone:
- 01865245841
- Email:
- mias.uk@ibnarabisociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window