Accounts and annual returns THE HEREDITARY SPASTIC PARAPLEGIA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1181539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 27 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 13 August 2024 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 13 August 2024 166 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 18 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 18 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 31 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window