Financial history THE HEREDITARY SPASTIC PARAPLEGIA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1181539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £107.27k £14.25k £32.74k £19.43k £31.60k
Total expenditure £11.35k £21.99k £29.59k £26.47k £39.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A