Trustees THE HEREDITARY SPASTIC PARAPLEGIA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1181539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Lawrence Chair 13 July 2019
None on record
Michael Thomas Payne Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Estelle Marshall Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Helen Louise Payne Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
JOHN MASON Trustee 24 August 2024
None on record
Juan Vazquez-Ruiz Trustee 15 July 2023
None on record
Mitesh Patel Trustee 15 February 2020
None on record
DAVID HARRIS Trustee 13 July 2019
None on record
Gerald Michael Cain Trustee 13 July 2019
None on record