AC WOLLATON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT MAYBE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES IN COMPLIANCE WITH REGULATIONS AND GUIDANCE FROM THE CHARITIES COMMISSION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERTO PIETRAFORTE | Chair | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA PIETRAFORTE | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.66k | £12.71k | £15.76k | £26.29k | £12.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.97k | £8.59k | £14.01k | £22.78k | £14.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 December 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 09 December 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 DEC 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES 4. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE 5. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT MAYBE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES IN COMPLIANCE WITH REGULATIONS AND GUIDANCE FROM THE CHARITIES COMMISSION
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 REPTON ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 7EJ
- Phone:
- 07855846655
- Email:
- roberto.pietraforte@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window