BRIDGNORTH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1181045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination in the UK and other parts of the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £121,980
Total expenditure: £81,233

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2018: CIO registration
  • 07 January 2021: Funds received from 1151894 BRIDGNORTH BAPTIST CHURCH
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Lindsay Ford-Thomson Trustee 01 October 2024
4FRONT THEATRE
Received: On time
Kimberley Ray Trustee 03 May 2020
None on record
Mark Gibbons Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Linda Mason Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £134.73k £133.21k £101.33k £121.98k
Total expenditure £0 £117.99k £119.39k £107.62k £81.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.19k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 December 2023 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 December 2023 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bridgnorth Baptist Church
7 West Castle Street
BRIDGNORTH
WV16 4AB
Phone:
01746768129
Email:
No information available