Oasis Mental Health Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide mental health services for those living in Solihull Borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £218,474 from 3 government contract(s) and £52,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Solihull
Governance
- 30 July 2018: Standard registration
- 26 May 2021: Funds received from 516058 SOLIHULL MIND
- OASIS MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT (Previous name)
- SOLIHULL MIND (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Bott | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Lawley | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Fitzhenry | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Musson | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SWALLOW | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Skiba | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER BROWN | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £467.24k | £712.50k | £653.17k | £462.97k | £426.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.90k | £447.00k | £482.09k | £574.89k | £612.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.29k | £428.81k | £331.12k | £204.44k | £218.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £99.56k | £52.00k | £52.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £41.40k | £26.81k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £2.12k | £3.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £662.04k | £605.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £74 | £13.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £6.88k | £3.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £435.18k | £470.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £11.83k | £11.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.25k | £16.52k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 AUG 2023 as amended on 24 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATION PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT. THESE OBJECTIVES ARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF NATIONAL MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH). THE AREA OF THE ASSOCIATION WILL BE THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SOLIHULL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oasis Mental Health Support
14-16 Faulkner Road
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 8SY
- Phone:
- 01217424941
- Email:
- contact@solihullmind.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window