LONDON HISTORICAL FENCING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LHFC runs HEMA classes in central London and offers grants to HEMA instructors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Tamplin | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Kerri-Nicola McArthur | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dan Powell | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
James MacIver | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.76k | £11.61k | £1.70k | £22.14k | £32.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.04k | £11.44k | £3.26k | £24.97k | £30.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL EUROPEAN MARTIAL ARTS BY PROVIDING TRAINING, SCHOLARSHIPS, COMPETITIONS AND TOURNAMENTS AND IS SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE THINK APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kennington Park Community Centre
8 Harleyford Street
LONDON
SE11 5SY
- Phone:
- 07821693807
- Email:
- londonhfc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
londonhistoricalfencing.club
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.