Financial history REDBRIDGE MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1180015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £99.06k £58.86k £124.35k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £2.00k £144.31k £5.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A