ATTITUDE MAGAZINE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Attitude Magazine Foundation provides assistance to those within the LGBTQ community who need help, providing direct assistance or connecting them with those best placed to provide it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR D STYLES OBE | Chair | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS TILLMON | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RUSSELL | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.61k | £731 | £30.01k | £37.21k | £53.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.67k | £57.15k | £44.52k | £31.27k | £59.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION [IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY] BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CAUSES WITHIN THE LGBT COMMUNITY AND ITS ALLIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COWSHED
LADYCROSS FARM
HOLLOW LANE
DORMANSLAND
LINGFIELD
- Phone:
- 01342872020
- Email:
- foundation@attitude.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window