THE OLD CHRIST'S HOSPITAL LINCOLNIANS EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing educational grants for past and present students of Lincoln Christ's Hospital School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 May 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE MILNES | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA M STRUTHERS | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROSAMUND RIMMER | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH BURGESS | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BARBARA RAMSAY | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115 | £115 | £115 | £115 | £156 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £2 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED BY S74 2C RESOLUTION
Charitable objects
ADVANCING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE, WHO HAVE BEEN PUPILS AT LINCOLN CHRIST'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL, OR AT THE FORMER CHRIST'S HOSPITAL GIRLS SCHOOL AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o THE GARTON ARCHIVE ROOM
LINCOLN CHRIST HOSPITAL SCHOOL
WRAGBY ROAD
LINCOLN
LN2 4PN
- Phone:
- 07873730727
- Email:
- post@totallincoln.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window