Accounts and annual returns MAMMAMIA LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1185198
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 September 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 September 2024 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 September 2023 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 September 2023 77 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 December 2022 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 December 2022 159 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 January 2022 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 January 2022 213 days late Download Open in new window