The Mark Chambers Foundation CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PEOPLE OF GHANA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUST SHALL THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ghana
Governance
- 11 March 2019: CIO registration
- MARK CHAMBERS' WHEELS OF HOPE CIO (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTINE CHAMBERS | Chair | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EVANS FCCA | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
UCAL ALLEN HENRY | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MCKINLEY | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £66 | £66 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Mar 2019 as amended on 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PEOPLE IN GHANA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 TEDDER ROAD
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 8AR
- Phone:
- 07896887586
- Email:
- mje1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window