GOLD GEESE

Charity Number: 1182332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting children through childhood cancer treatments and their families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £231,106
Total expenditure: £185,946

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATIE ELLEN SOUTHGATE Chair 01 May 2018
None on record
Sally Bailey Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Andrew Sterry Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Elena Bays Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Laura Peters Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
ANNA VICTORIA WHYTE Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
LOUISETTE MARGUERITE MULLIN Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £165.46k £95.80k £125.56k £143.08k £231.11k
Total expenditure £79.14k £60.43k £112.81k £149.34k £185.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 18 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KINGSLEY HOUSE
22-24 ELM ROAD
LEIGH-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS9 1SN
Phone:
01702808285