Our Lady of Ransom School Parents’ Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parents of Children at Our Lady of Ransom School raising money for the school to enhance the Children's learning experience and also help the wider community. Based at Our Lady of Ransom School Rayleigh. Raising funds through charity events for the school community and Catholic community in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 09 August 2018: Standard registration
- OUR LADY OF RANSOM PARENTS ASOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dulieu | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kate Cooper | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Konstantina-Maria Balta | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.91k | £13.60k | £8.37k | £3.25k | £22.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.27k | £8.19k | £8.05k | £7.24k | £27.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2023 | 330 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 April 2022 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JAN 2017 as amended on 20 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Our Lady Of Ransom Primary School
Little Wheatley Chase
RAYLEIGH
Essex
SS6 9EH
- Phone:
- 01268-785741
- Email:
- info@olorcps-pa.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window