NICOLAUS COPERNICUS PETERBOROUGH POLISH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity runs a Polish School which provides education in Polish language, traditions, history, geography and culture for four hours on a Saturday morning during term time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £27,189 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 01 August 2018: CIO registration
- 19 March 2021: Funds received from 1162636 NICOLAS COPERNICUS POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL PARENTS ...
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karol Piotrowski | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasza Zastawna | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Kaminska | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £112.34k | £129.76k | £158.39k | £186.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £113.03k | £134.98k | £150.26k | £173.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | £27.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Aug 2018 as amended on 22 May 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT. 2) TO PROVIDE LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES FOR STUDENTS ATTENDING PPS VIA BOTH STRUCTURES ACTIVITIES AND AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS. 3) TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES AND ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST JOHN FISHER CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL
PARK LANE
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 5JN
- Phone:
- 07593356530
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window