EWAN LANE MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of music education and, for the public benefit, the relief of those in need by reason of youth and financial hardship or other disadvantage. To transform the lives of children and young people living in the most challenging of circumstances in Canvey Island and Essex through the provision of space, instruments, instruction and performance opportunities not otherwise available
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 14 November 2018: CIO registration
- EWAN’S MUSIC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP LANE OBE | Chair | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RORY PATRICK LANE | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY WOOD | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
FINN JAMES LANE | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DIANE JENKINS | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN ROBERT KNIGHT | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ERIN MADELEINE BAUCUTT | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE GOLDSMITH | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRACY MARGARET FUNSTON | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS EMMA LANE | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £10.65k | £10.02k | £20.83k | £3.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.92k | £4.52k | £14.38k | £9.52k | £13.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC BY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING BURSARIES FOR INSTRUMENTS, WORKSHOPS, CONCERTS AND LESSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 LEIGH CLIFF ROAD
LEIGH-ON-SEA
SS9 1DN
- Phone:
- 07864280419
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window