EPWORTH INVESTMENT FUNDS FOR CHARITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Epworth Investment Funds for Charities is a Charity Authorised Investment Fund which is available for investment by charities. The fund currently has six sub funds. Epworth Investment Management Limited is the manager of the fund. More information can be found at the following website: www.epworthinvestment.co.uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Bank of New York Mellon (International) Limited | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Waystone Management (UK) Limited | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82m | £9.18m | £17.18m | £15.21m | £10.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £637.00k | £1.29m | £1.56m | £1.57m | £1.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
8.1 SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 8.2, THE TRUST'S CHARITABLE OBJECTIVE WILL BE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITIES THAT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY HOLD UNITS IN THE SUB-FUNDS FROM TIME TO TIME. 8.2 IF AT ANY TIME THERE ARE NO UNITHOLDERS IN ANY SUB-FUND, THE AUTHORISED FUND MANAGER AND DEPOSITARY WILL DETERMINE THE TRUST'S CHARITABLE PURPOSES. 8.3 NO CHANGE MAY BE MADE TO THIS DEED WHICH WOULD: 8.3.1 CAUSE THE TRUST TO CEASE TO BE A CHARITY; OR 8.3.2 AUTHORISE UNITS TO BE ISSUED OR TRANSFERRED TO, OR HELD BY, ANY PERSON OTHER THAN AN ELIGIBLE INVESTOR, WHETHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH A NOMINEE. 8.4 NO REVOCATION, VARIATION OR AMENDMENT OF THIS DEED WHICH WOULD, OR MIGHT, BE INCONSISTENT WITH THE TRUST'S STATUS AS A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND (ESTABLISHED PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 96 TO 99 OF THE CHARITIES ACT) WILL BE VALID WITHOUT THE PRIOR WRITTEN APPROVAL OF THE COURT OR OF THE COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Link Group
Central Square
29 Wellington Street
LEEDS
LS1 4DL
- Phone:
- 02045586759
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window