DEMENTIA FRIENDLY PARISHES AROUND THE YEALM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to promote individual and inclusive dementia friendly based activities and services for people with dementia, their carers and families in the communities of the parishes of Wembury, Brixton, Yealmpton, Newton & Noss and Holbeton in the County of Devon ;To support people living with dementia and their families to remain active and involved in their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,375 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 17 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH HITCHINS MA | Chair | 26 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Wendy Penney-Cousins | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GINA PATRICIA BASTARD | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA ISOBEL WIRGMAN | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE HIRST | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN HEARN | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MAIRI MACKAY ASIAN DEL BARCO | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DERMOD MICHAEL DROUGHT | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.79k | £37.19k | £18.82k | £55.26k | £45.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.27k | £31.38k | £24.95k | £47.46k | £33.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.10k | N/A | £6.13k | £3.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS RESIDING IN THE PARISHES OF WEMBURY, BRIXTON, YEALMPTON, NEWTON FERRERS & NOSS MAYO AND HOLBETON BY UNDERTAKING INITIATIVES DESIGNED TO ENSURE THAT PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA FEEL UNDERSTOOD AND INCLUDED AND CAN CONFIDENTLY CONTRIBUTE TO COMMUNITY LIFE AND TO DEVELOP DEMENTIA FRIENDLY COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO PERSONS LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; B) MAKING THE VIEWS AND EXPERIENCES OF PERSONS LIVING WITH DEMENTIA KNOWN TO SERVICE PROVIDERS IN THE COMMUNITY; C) ENABLING PERSONS LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS TO HAVE A VOICE IN THE DEVELOPMENT, DELIVERY AND EQUALITY OF ACCESS OF LOCAL SERVICES AND FACILITIES; D) PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT DEMENTIA AND ASSOCIATED PROBLEMS ARISING FROM AGEING, ILLNESS OR DISEASE; E) RAISING AWARENESS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY OF THE NATURE AND EFFECTS OF DEMENTIA ON PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PIPPINS
HORN LANE
BRIXTON
PLYMOUTH
PL8 2AB
- Phone:
- 01752880715
- Email:
- treasurer@dementiayealm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window