DROITWICH SPA & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education in all its forms of eligible members principally via special interest groups, regular general meetings and educational visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 November 2018: Standard registration
- DROITWICH SPA U3A (Working name)
- DROITWICH U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Timothy Bracey | Chair | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Mary Smith | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Ackrill | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Clare Waite | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Short | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Hibbitt | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Arthur Stollard | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Barry Tait | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Everard | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LES HAZLEWOOD | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.77k | £4.93k | £8.48k | £13.99k | £15.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £4.12k | £10.70k | £12.05k | £16.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hammond Close
DROITWICH
Worcestershire
WR9 7SZ
- Phone:
- 01905 412337
- Email:
- mike@bracey-online.com
- Website:
-
u3asites.org.uk/droitwich
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window