EASTINGTON SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The school parents association runs fundraising events and activities to provide great experiences for the children of Eastington School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZOE AVASTU | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||
AMANDA HYDE | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW CURTIS | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.95k | £1.75k | £2.47k | £2.97k | £10.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.05k | £3.95k | £1.63k | £3.01k | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 29 June 2022 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 10 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eastington Cp School
Churchend
Eastington
Stonehouse
GL10 3SB
- Phone:
- 01453822922
- Email:
- matt@curtismr.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window