FRIENDS OF WOODSEATS PLAYGROUND: GRAVES PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Woodseats Playground: Graves Park work closely together with Woodseats community to raise money through local and national fundraising, Grants and Trusts to regenerate Woodseats playground. We aim to make the playground more inclusive and appealing to families and children of all ages by adding new play equipment and landscaping the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Walters | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lonsdale | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Spence | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Tarrant | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simone Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stelios Eleftheriou | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Foster | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Henshaw | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Sophie Keegan | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alethea Ottewell | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Kemp | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.27k | £2.54k | £24.13k | £21.10k | £4.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92k | £4.78k | £11.03k | £20.01k | £7.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £2.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE WOODSEATS PLAYGROUND AND ITS ENVIRONS OVER AND ABOVE THAT WHICH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY ARE REQUIRED BY LAW TO PROVIDE. THE GROUP WILL FULFIL THE OBJECTIVE BY: (A) CARRYING OUT AND PROMOTING BOTH ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT (C) INVOLVING LOCAL PEOPLE IN IMPROVING THE AREA (D) PROMOTING SPORT, COMMUNITY RECREATION AND PLAY (E) PROMOTING THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA AND WORKING TOGETHER AS RESIDENTS REGARDLESS OF AGE, ETHNIC ORIGIN, ABILITY, SEX, BELIEF OR POLITICAL AFFILIATION RECOGNISING THE VALUE OF OUR MANY DIFFERENCES (F) WORK WITH SIMILAR GROUPS AND EXCHANGE INFORMATION AND ADVICE WITH THEM
Area of benefit
ABERDARE PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Moor View Road
SHEFFIELD
S8 0HH
- Phone:
- 07974211923
- Email:
- woodseatspark@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window