The DEMBE Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation gives grants to organisations that help advance a well-rounded education to children and young people under 25 in the UK. The Foundation also runs its own or co-created programmes to help children and young people realise their potential and expand their professional and personal horizons. No unsolicited requests are accepted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 March 2019: CIO registration
- THE GRASS ROOTS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE DAVID EVANS GRASS ROOTS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WILLIAM EVANS MBE | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM WRAGG MP | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN DENTON | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.70k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 July 2022 | 441 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2019 as amended on 08 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: • AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS OR OTHER EQUIPMENT; AND • PROVIDING TO SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THOSE SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pennyroyal Court
Station Road
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 5QY
- Phone:
- 03302234440
- Email:
- Harry.white@exec-assist.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window