MARTIN'S CHARITY FASHION EVENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, through the establishment in life of newly graduated and current undergraduate fashion students, by: 1. The organising and the running of events, to provide employment opportunities and experience, related to working in the fashion industries, inclusive of the annual graduate fashion week event 2. The advancement of education by various means in particular but not limited
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN KRUCZYK | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ayesha Khalid | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PEIYING JIANG | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.06k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.46k | £0 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE OF NEWLY GRADUATED AND CURRENT UNDERGRADUATE FASHION STUDENTS, BY: 1. THE ORGANISING AND THE RUNNING OF EVENTS, TO PROVIDE EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND EXPERIENCE, RELATED TO WORKING IN THE FASHION INDUSTRIES, INCLUSIVE OF THE ANNUAL GRADUATE FASHION WEEK EVENT 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY VARIOUS MEANS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE SUBJECTS OF BUSINESS AND FINANCE AND ANY OTHER SUBJECTS RELATED TO THE FASHION INDUSTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
135 GREEN DRAGON LANE
LONDON
N21 1EU
- Phone:
- 07505807922
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window