CARERS' HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an independent local charity based in Brixton. Our work stems from the fact that carers' lives can be negatively impacted in all sorts of ways as a result of their caring role. Whether financial, educational or otherwise, we seek to limit the challenges that carers face in two key ways: by working with carers directly, and by influencing the local services and policies that affect them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £330,186 from 3 government contract(s) and £93,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 February 2019: Standard registration
- CARERS HUB LAMBETH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Perkins | Chair | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louis Xavier Levin | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Caroline Goulder | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ijeoma Obi | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oritseweyinmi Guate | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Joanna Clare Oka | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Wall | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hebditch | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Ralph Hynard | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352.71k | £344.28k | £389.04k | £448.51k | £497.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.55k | £313.52k | £359.07k | £418.83k | £463.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £264.95k | £264.95k | £301.19k | £330.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £62.07k | £9.00k | £93.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUN 2018 as amended on 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AND BENEFICIARIES IN ENGLAND AND WALES. "BENEFICIARIES" MEANS ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE. "CARERS" MEANS ANY PERSON INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF CARE WITHOUT RECEIVING REMUNERATION OTHER THAN STATUTORY BENEFITS, FOR A PERSON OR PEOPLE WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARERS' HUB
336 BRIXTON ROAD
LONDON
SW9 7AA
- Phone:
- 02075018970
- Email:
- connect@carershub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window