Accounts and annual returns MANNAS EMPOWERMENT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1179966
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 April 2025 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 April 2025 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 March 2024 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 March 2024 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 June 2023 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 June 2023 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2021 318 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2021 318 days late Download Open in new window