Financial history MANNAS EMPOWERMENT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1179966
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.69k £2.69k £2.38k £9.85k £10.82k
Total expenditure £2.94k £2.94k £1.29k £7.92k £9.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A