BRISTOL CHILDREN'S PLAYHOUSE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE BRISTOL CHILDRENS PLAYHOUSE IS A PRE-SCHOOL WITH A 2'S AND 3'S ROOM. WE PROVIDE SUPPORT IN EARLY YEARS DEVELOPMENT AS WELL AS SAFEGUARDING THE WELFARE OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE FAMILY. THE PLAYHOUSE IS SITUATED IN ONE OF THE MOST DISADVANTAGED AND CULTURALLY DIVERSE AREAS OF BRISTOL. WE PROVIDE A SAFE PLACE TO MEET AND PLAY TO ENABLE PARENTS AND CHILDREN TO GAIN POSITIVE EXPERIENCES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £150,741 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 25 July 2018: Standard registration
- 13 June 2023: Funds received from 277462 BRISTOL CHILDREN'S PLAYHOUSE
- BRISTOL CHILDREN'S PLAYHOUSE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Wild | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sara Dennison | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Adams | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Krista Lahey-James | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Callen | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £174.34k | £162.68k | £195.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £167.97k | £160.27k | £191.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £153.57k | £130.85k | £150.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN, PARENTS AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRISTOL CHILDREN'S PLAYHOUSE
BERKELEY GREEN ROAD
GREENBANK
BRISTOL
BS5 6LU
- Phone:
- 01179510037
- Email:
- admin@bcph.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window