MOVING SENSES POSITIVE FUTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide comprehensive support. Promote mental health and wellbeing. Empower families. Create inclusive environments to facilitate activities and workshops such as sports, arts and crafts, mindfulness and sensory play. Together these objectives aim to ensure that every child/young person with SEND can reach their full potential in an inclusive, supporting and nurturing environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
Total income includes £20,333 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 26 November 2018: CIO registration
- MOVING SENSES COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Naylor | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Patricia Dooley | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK JONATHON CHAPMAN | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.04k | £66.04k | £121.66k | £115.67k | £93.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.51k | £45.51k | £116.94k | £124.81k | £116.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.18k | £4.94k | £36.31k | £20.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2020
(These accounts |
12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ANY CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS. THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, LIVING IN KNOWSLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND SUPPORT THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SAFE PLAY, HIGHLIGHTING THE POSITIVE CONTRIBUTIONS MADE BY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN THE COMMUNITY, SCHOOLS AND COLLEGE LIFE AND WORKING WITH PARENTS, CARERS AND OTHER STAKEHOLDERS GIVING ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON THE ISSUES THAT AFFECT THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
King George V Sports Complex
Longview Lane
LIVERPOOL
L36 7UN
- Phone:
- 07846784378
- Email:
- info@movingsenses.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window