POSITIVE MINDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One-off activities for older people. Regular groups for older people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 11 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 11 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH IN OLDER PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE IMPACT OF POOR MENTAL HEALTH B) DEVELOPING PREVENTION WORK PROJECTS AND MODELS FOR SELF-CARE WHICH EMPOWER OLDER PEOPLE TO MAINTAIN GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND RESILIENCE C) SIGNPOSTING OLDER PEOPLE TO SUPPORT SERVICES AND SOCIAL GROUPS D) WORKING COLLABORATIVELY WITH GROUPS SUPPORTING OLDER PEOPLE AND THE AGENCIES THAT WORK WITH THEM E) ORGANISING EVENTS AND TRAINING TO SUPPORT ORGANISATIONS TO WORK MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH OLDER PEOPLE WITH POOR MENTAL HEALTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window