INSPIRE NORTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities are restricted to exclusively charitable purposes for those in need due to age, housing or mental/physical health including prevention/relief of financial hardship or other need, relieve sickness and preserve health, support with unemployment, support and promote education including advice therapy and training & promoting charities efficiency and effectiveness including use of resource.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£24,020,897
Donations and legacies | £19.68k | |
Charitable activities | £12.21m | |
Other trading activities | £1.18m | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £10.61m |
Total expenditure:
£23,949,005
Raising funds | £25.00k | |
Charitable activities | £12.13m | |
Other | £11.80m |
-£35,458 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £15,712,785 from 41 government contract(s) and £473,531 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.13m | |
Retained for future use | £71.89k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 2018: Standard registration
- 14 October 2024: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.91m | £21.95m | £22.98m | £24.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.66m | £20.92m | £22.80m | £23.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £17.02m | £15.71m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £511.25k | £473.53k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £60.18k | £105.91k | £19.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.35m | £1.22m | £1.15m | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.61m | £9.88m | £10.53m | £12.21m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £31.00k | £12.39k | £26.02k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £9.91m | £10.77m | £11.17m | £10.61m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.51m | £9.97m | £10.88m | £12.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £23.47k | £0 | £25.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.00k | £17.00k | £218.70k | £26.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £10.15m | £10.93m | £11.93m | £11.80m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.20m | £2.11m | £2.96m | £2.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £561.00k | £651.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £7.08m | £8.11m | £10.14m | £9.25m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.68m | -£5.40m | -£2.93m | -£3.10m | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.35m | £3.93m | £6.50m | £5.45m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR THOSE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR AGE, HOUSING NEED, AND/OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; 3.3 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, THERAPY AND TRAINING TO THOSE IN NEED; 3.5 PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS OBJECT, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES);
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window