YORKSHIRE ADOPTION AGENCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yorkshire Adoption Agency is a voluntary adoption agency which recruits, trains, prepares and assesses prospective adopters for children requiring new families who orignate from both the UK and overseas. We also provide a post adoption support service to families who have adopted through the agency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£886,398
Donations and legacies | £3.50k | |
Charitable activities | £854.29k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £23.61k | |
Other | £5.00k |
Total expenditure:
£924,829
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £924.83k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £40,631 from 6 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £924.83k |
People

21 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 May 1982: Standard registration
- THE DONCASTER ADOPTION AND FAMILY WELFARE SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- YORKSHIRE ADOPTION AGENCY LTD (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hanora D'Rosario | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pratik Mistry | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Askey | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Rolfe | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Giddens | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Scott | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scott Bramall | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Lloyd Powell | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jason Grimwood | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KEEGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £706.63k | £1.15m | £1.03m | £974.49k | £886.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £678.72k | £758.17k | £868.46k | £931.72k | £924.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £62.50k | £326.45k | £67.48k | £40.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £154.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £626 | £975 | £393 | £3.41k | £3.50k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £701.52k | £989.88k | £1.02m | £960.89k | £854.29k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.48k | £419 | £168 | £5.20k | £23.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £678.72k | £758.11k | £866.89k | £927.44k | £924.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.43k | £47.01k | £73.33k | £66.33k | £55.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £67 | £1.57k | £4.27k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £222.03k | £216.69k | £218.49k | £207.29k | £198.91k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £971.54k | £1.42m | £1.54m | £1.55m | £1.54m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £158.90k | £208.13k | £171.07k | £124.28k | £147.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OR ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 1982 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 JULY 2008 as amended on 18 May 2020 as amended on 07 Sep 2021 as amended on 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
To relieve the needs of children who are without families able to care adequately for them and to promote the relief and care of such children by the provision of substitute families able to meet their needs or by other means
Area of benefit
DONCASTER AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorkshire Adoption Agency Ltd
Loversall Court
Tickhill Road
DONCASTER
DN4 8QG
- Phone:
- 01302638337
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window