ANIKA FOOD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We distribute food along with food hampers, baby essentials, toiletries, sanitary kits, dental kits etc to those who need it along with other basic necessities. We also provide emergency food parcels. We conduct classes & workshops on period poverty, dental hygiene and support, CV classes, life skills workshops and a support group. We also try to do delivery of cooked meals to those who need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
- Hounslow
Governance
- 25 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JYOTI WALIA | Chair | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Krish Walia | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shivangi Walia | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAJENDRA WALIA | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shivani Anika WALIA | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/07/2019 | 27/07/2020 | 27/07/2021 | 27/07/2022 | 27/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 July 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2019 | 19 June 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2019 | 19 June 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2018 as amended on 04 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HOUNSLOW, EALING AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A DROP IN CENTRE PROVIDING FREE HOT AND COLD FOOD TO PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS AND IN FINANCIAL NEED TOGETHER WITH ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING AND SUPPORT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TRAFALGAR HOUSE
LONGFIELD AVENUE
DICKENS YARD
EALING
W5 2TJ
- Phone:
- 07734999535
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window