THE JASMINE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jasmine Foundation's aim is trying to help female cancer patients with reproductive system in memory of my Mum who died from cancer of the womb in Vietnam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Vietnam
Governance
- 25 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHI THI THANH HUYNH-BALDOCK | Chair | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID BALDOCK | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN TRUMTEL | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID BALDOCK | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SLEIGHT | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £545 | £324 | £305 | £265 | £258 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £15 | £60 | £101 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG WOMEN IN VIETNAM SUFFERING FROM CANCER, PARTICULARLY THOSE WITH CANCER OF THE REPRODUCTIVE SYSTEM SUCH AS CANCER OF THE WOMB, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY: 1. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO SUCH PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE AUTHORITIES IN VIETNAM; 2. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AFTERCARE SUPPORT SERVICES TO SUCH PATIENTS IN THEIR OWN HOME; 3. PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PATIENTS WHILST THEY ARE IN HOSPITAL WHERE THEY ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; AND 4. PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCERS OF THE REPRODUCTIVE SYSTEM AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Julius House
New North Road
EXETER
EX4 4HG
- Phone:
- 07999666886
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window