THE OXFORD OPHTHALMOLOGICAL CONGRESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education in the science and practical development of ophthalmology and allied subjects, principally through an annual scientific congress. Promoting scientific research relating to ophthalmology and allied subjects by providing a platform for presentation and dissemination of such research and by the provision of grants and bursaries in support of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 January 2019: CIO registration
- 09 March 2020: Funds received from 326002 THE OXFORD EYE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha de Silva | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Talks | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Mandeep Singh Sagoo | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Pilling | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM KINDER | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL STEWART | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Manoj Parulekar | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.31k | £70 | £31.72k | £127.78k | £112.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.19k | £32.96k | £32.57k | £113.85k | £128.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (THE OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICAL DEVELOPMENT OF OPHTHALMOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS; B) PROMOTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH RELATING TO OPHTHALMOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR PRESENTATION AND DISSEMINATION OF SUCH RESEARCH AND BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BURSARIES IN SUPPORT OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMERONS SOLICITORS LLP
70 WIMPOLE STREET
LONDON
W1G 8AX
- Phone:
- 02074675424
- Email:
- SECRETARIAT@OOC.UK.COM
- Website:
-
ooc.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window