GO BARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefits to advance the education of children in developing work, in particular Northern Uganda, particularly but not exclusively, by the provision of mentoring, providing school shoes, school uniform, school books and tuition fees. Carefully selected volunteers on grounds to donate schools shoes, uniform, books and support students, through training and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Friday Oyella Odong | Chair | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Wagaine | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 248 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD, IN PARTICULAR NORTHERN UGANDA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL SHOES, SCHOOL UNIFORM, SCHOOL BOOKS AND TUITION FEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 COLLENSWOOD ROAD
STEVENAGE
SG2 9ER
- Phone:
- 07984589828
- Email:
- c.odong@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window